Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincent Martin Leonard

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Dec 1908Born
16 Jun 193526.5Ordained PriestPriest of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, USA
28 Feb 196455.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, USA
28 Feb 196455.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Arsacal
21 Apr 196455.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arsacal
1 Jun 196960.4AppointedBishop of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, USA
30 Jun 198374.5RetiredBishop of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, USA
28 Aug 199485.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary for Vincent Martin Leonard
Bishop Vincent Martin Leonard (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Pittsburgh

EventPlace
Birth PlacePittsburgh, Diocese of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania
Ordained PriestLatrobe, PA, Diocese of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania

  • a priest for 59.1 years
  • a bishop for 30.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)
  • c1: CB, 9 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast