Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Michael Quinn

Bishop of Winona-Rochester, Minnesota, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Dec 1945 Born
17 Mar 197226.2Ordained PriestPriest of Detroit, Michigan, USA
7 Jul 200357.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Detroit, Michigan, USA
7 Jul 200357.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Ressiana
12 Aug 200357.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ressiana
15 Oct 200862.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Winona, Minnesota, USA
11 Dec 200862.9InstalledCoadjutor Bishop of Winona, Minnesota, USA
7 May 200963.3SucceededBishop of Winona, Minnesota, USA

MicroData Summary for John Michael Quinn
Bishop John Michael Quinn (born ) Bishop of Winona-Rochester

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDetroit, Archdiocese of Detroit, Michigan
Ordained PriestSt. Raymond, Church, Detroit, Archdiocese of Detroit, Michigan
Ordained BishopMost Blessed Sacrament, Cathedral, Detroit, Archdiocese of Detroit, Michigan

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Winona-Rochester.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Oct 2008
  • s: Bollettino, 7 May 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Number 14,435

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast