Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Ronald Reiss

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Detroit, Michigan, USA

Titular Bishop of Remesiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Nov 1940 Born
4 Jun 196625.5Ordained PriestPriest of Detroit, Michigan, USA
7 Jul 200362.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Detroit, Michigan, USA
7 Jul 200362.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Remesiana
12 Aug 200362.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Remesiana
11 Nov 201575.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Detroit, Michigan, USA

MicroData Summary for Francis Ronald Reiss (VIAF: 311428225)
Bishop Francis Ronald Reiss (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Detroit

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDetroit, Archdiocese of Detroit, Michigan
Ordained BishopMost Blessed Sacrament, Cathedral, Detroit, Archdiocese of Detroit, Michigan

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Detroit.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Number 14,434
  • r: Bollettino, 11 Nov 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 29 Mar 2018