Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alexander King Sample

Archbishop of Portland in Oregon, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Nov 1960 Born
1 Jun 199029.5Ordained PriestPriest of Marquette, Michigan, USA
13 Dec 200545.0AppointedBishop of Marquette, Michigan, USA
25 Jan 200645.2Ordained BishopBishop of Marquette, Michigan, USA
29 Jan 201352.2AppointedArchbishop of Portland in Oregon, USA
2 Apr 201352.4InstalledArchbishop of Portland in Oregon, USA

MicroData Summary for Alexander King Sample
Archbishop Alexander King Sample (born ) Archbishop of Portland in Oregon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKalispell, MT

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Portland in Oregon.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 13 Dec 2005
  • ob/c1: Website of the Diocese
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 184, Number 15,046
  • ab: Bollettino, 29 Jan 2013
  • i: CB, 31 Jan 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast