Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alexander Joseph Brunett

Archbishop Emeritus of Seattle, Washington, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jan 1934 Born
13 Jul 195824.4Ordained PriestPriest of Detroit, Michigan, USA
19 Apr 199460.2AppointedBishop of Helena, Montana, USA
6 Jul 199460.4Ordained BishopBishop of Helena, Montana, USA
28 Oct 199763.7AppointedArchbishop of Seattle, Washington, USA
18 Dec 199763.9InstalledArchbishop of Seattle, Washington, USA
16 Sep 201076.6RetiredArchbishop of Seattle, Washington, USA

MicroData Summary for Alexander Joseph Brunett
Archbishop Alexander Joseph Brunett (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Seattle

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDetroit

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Seattle.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 16 Sep 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 139, Number 12,349

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast