Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Albert Murray

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Kalamazoo, Michigan, USA


from the Official Web Site of the Diocese

from the Official Web Site of the Diocese

Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jul 1932Born
7 Jun 195825.9Ordained PriestPriest of Lansing, Michigan, USA
18 Nov 199765.3AppointedBishop of Kalamazoo, Michigan, USA
27 Jan 199865.5Ordained BishopBishop of Kalamazoo, Michigan, USA
6 Apr 200976.7RetiredBishop of Kalamazoo, Michigan, USA
5 Jun 202087.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Kalamazoo, Michigan, USA

MicroData Summary for James Albert Murray
Bishop James Albert Murray (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Kalamazoo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJackson
Ordained BishopSaint Augustine, Cathedral, Kalamazoo, Diocese of Kalamazoo, Michigan
Death PlaceKalamazoo, Diocese of Kalamazoo, Michigan
Buried Place (Original)Mount Olivet, Cemetery, Kalamazoo, Diocese of Kalamazoo, Michigan

  • a priest for 61.9 years
  • a bishop for 22.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 6 Apr 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Number 13,230
  • d: CB, 6 Jun 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 7 Jun 2020

Quantcast