Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Emanuel Mabathoana, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Maseru, Lesotho


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Dec 1904Born
28 Jun 193429.4Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
11 Dec 195247.9AppointedBishop of Leribe, Lesotho
25 Mar 195348.2Ordained BishopBishop of Leribe, Lesotho
3 Jan 196156.0AppointedArchbishop of Maseru, Lesotho
20 Sep 196661.7DiedArchbishop of Maseru, Lesotho

MicroData Summary for Emanuel Mabathoana
Archbishop Emanuel Mabathoana O.M.I. (born , died ) Archbishop of Maseru

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMafiken-Roma

  • a priest for 32.2 years
  • a bishop for 13.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast