Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph Gotthardt, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Windhoek, Namibia

Titular Archbishop of Mopsuestia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Dec 1880Born
15 May 190524.4Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
11 Jan 192140.0AppointedPrefect of Cimbebasia, Namibia
18 May 192645.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Mopsuestia
18 May 192645.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Windhoek, Namibia
5 Sep 192645.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mopsuestia
28 Jul 195170.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Mopsuestia
20 Mar 196180.2RetiredVicar Apostolic of Windhoek, Namibia
3 Aug 196382.6DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Windhoek, Namibia

MicroData Summary for Joseph Gotthardt
Archbishop Joseph Gotthardt O.M.I. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Windhoek

EventPlace
Birth PlaceThalheim, Germany

  • a priest for 58.2 years
  • a bishop for 36.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1926, Number 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast