Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop William Patrick Whelan, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Bloemfontein, South Africa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Apr 1907Born
21 Jun 193124.1Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
11 Mar 194840.8AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Johannesburg, South Africa
11 Mar 194840.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Legia
27 May 194841.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Legia
25 Nov 195043.5SucceededVicar Apostolic of Johannesburg, South Africa
11 Jan 195143.7AppointedBishop of Johannesburg, South Africa
18 Jul 195447.2AppointedArchbishop of Bloemfontein, South Africa
10 Feb 196658.7DiedArchbishop of Bloemfontein, South Africa

MicroData Summary for William Patrick Whelan
Archbishop William Patrick Whelan O.M.I. (born , died ) Archbishop of Bloemfontein

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWakkerstroom

  • a priest for 34.6 years
  • a bishop for 17.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 53

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018