Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Bonhomme, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Basutoland, Lesotho

Titular Bishop of Tulana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jan 1889Born
18 May 191829.3Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
25 Apr 193344.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Basutoland, Lesotho
25 Apr 193344.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Tulana
28 Jun 193344.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tulana
8 Mar 194758.1ResignedVicar Apostolic of Basutoland, Lesotho
6 Aug 197384.5DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Basutoland, Lesotho

MicroData Summary for Joseph Bonhomme
Bishop Joseph Bonhomme O.M.I. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Basutoland

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Camille-de-Wotton, Canada

  • a priest for 55.2 years
  • a bishop for 40.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1933, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast