Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Augustin Dontenwill, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Vancouver, British Columbia, Canada

Titular Archbishop of Ptolemais in Phoenicia

Superior General of Oblates of Mary Immaculate


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jun 1857Born
15 Aug 188023.1ProfessedMember of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
30 May 188527.9Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
3 Apr 189739.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of New Westminster, British Columbia, Canada
3 Apr 189739.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Germanicopolis
22 Aug 189740.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Germanicopolis
1 Jun 189941.9SucceededBishop of New Westminster, British Columbia, Canada
19 Sep 190851.2AppointedArchbishop of Vancouver, British Columbia, Canada
20 Sep 190851.2AppointedSuperior General of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
15 Dec 190851.5ResignedArchbishop of Vancouver, British Columbia, Canada
29 Jan 190951.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Ptolemais in Phoenicia
30 Nov 193174.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Vancouver, British Columbia, Canada

MicroData Summary for Augustin Dontenwill (VIAF: 305115092)
Archbishop Augustin Dontenwill O.M.I. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Vancouver

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBischwiller, France
Ordained BishopNew Westminster, Diocese of New Westminster, British Columbia
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 46.5 years
  • a bishop for 34.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: JPG
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 285, and Page 408
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1897, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017