Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pius Bonaventura Dlamini, F.F.J. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Mariannhill

Titular Bishop of Unizibira

Titular See: (Fran. Fam. S. Guis.)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
May 1908BornMariathal
28 Nov 193729.5Ordained PriestPriest of Other
21 Feb 195445.8AppointedBishop of Umzimkulu, South Africa
26 Apr 195445.9Ordained BishopBishop of Umzimkulu, South Africa
14 Dec 196759.6ResignedBishop of Umzimkulu, South Africa
14 Dec 196759.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mariannhill, South Africa
14 Dec 196759.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Unizibira
13 Sep 198173.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Mariannhill, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Pius Bonaventura Dlamini:
Bishop Pius Bonaventura Dlamini F.F.J. (born May 1908, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Mariannhill

  • a priest for 43.7 years
  • a bishop for 27.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015