Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Pretoria

Archidioecesis Praetoriensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • William Matthew Slattery, O.F.M., Archbishop
  • George Francis Daniel, Archbishop Emeritus
  • Paul Mandla Khumalo, C.M.M., Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 11 January 1951
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: South Africa
  • Square Kilometers: 16,573 (6,401 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://archdioceseofpta.org.za/
  • Mailing Address: P.O. Box 17245, Groenkloof 0027, Pretoria, South Africa
  • Telephone: (012)460-2048
  • Fax: 460-2452

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Pretoria
9 April 1948ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Kimberley in South Africa {nell’Africa Meridionale}
Vicariate Apostolic of Transvaal
Vicariate Apostolic of Pretoria (erected)
Archdiocese of Pretoria
11 January 1951ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Pretoria Archdiocese of Pretoria
28 June 1971Territory LostArchdiocese of Pretoria Prefecture Apostolic of Rustenburg (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Pretoria
195015,130578,3912.6%51722687209913ap1951
Archdiocese of Pretoria
197073,6021,320,8005.6%43601037148426341ap1971
1980114,3471,419,5008.1%2450741,54599224446ap1981
1990154,8542,415,8916.4%2864921,6832116926353ap1991
1999168,1023,007,0005.6%32701021,6481513719761ap2000
2000169,2613,051,4795.5%39781171,4461614714460ap2001
2001169,2804,500,0003.8%38811191,4221618417559ap2002
2002169,0004,500,0003.8%39821211,3961414119359ap2003
2003174,0004,590,0003.8%38651031,6891312419359ap2004
2004186,3834,705,0004.0%46671131,6491212616659ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_d, v3.0.3, 15 Nov 2014; Data: 10 Dec 2014