Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Maximilian von Lingg

Deceased

Bishop of Augsburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Mar 1842BornNesselwang
22 Jul 186523.4Ordained PriestPriest of Augsburg, Germany
18 Mar 190260.0SelectedBishop of Augsburg, Germany
9 Jun 190260.3ConfirmedBishop of Augsburg, Germany
20 Jul 190260.4Ordained BishopBishop of Augsburg, Germany
31 May 193088.2DiedBishop of Augsburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Maximilian von Lingg:
Bishop Maximilian von Lingg (born , died ) Bishop of Augsburg

  • a priest for 64.9 years
  • a bishop for 27.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 131
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1902, Number 46
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 73

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013