Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Friedrich Philipp von Abert

Deceased

Archbishop of Bamberg, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 May 1852Born
20 Feb 187522.8Ordained PriestPriest of Würzburg, Germany
7 Feb 190552.7SelectedArchbishop of Bamberg, Germany
27 Mar 190552.9ConfirmedArchbishop of Bamberg, Germany
1 May 190553.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Bamberg, Germany
23 Apr 191259.9DiedArchbishop of Bamberg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Friedrich Philipp von Abert (VIAF: 17962732)
Archbishop Friedrich Philipp von Abert (born , died ) Archbishop of Bamberg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMünnerstadt

  • a priest for 37.1 years
  • a bishop for 6.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1905, Number 25
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 78

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast