Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cassian (Franz Anton) Spiess (Spieß), O.S.B. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Southern Zanguebar {Zanguebar Meridionale}, Tanzania

Titular Bishop of Ostracine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jul 1866Born
24 Apr 188922.7Ordained PriestPriest
15 Aug 189226.0ProfessedPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
17 Sep 190236.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Southern Zanguebar {Zanguebar Meridionale}, Tanzania
17 Sep 190236.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Ostracine
16 Nov 190236.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ostracine
14 Mar 190538.6DiedVicar Apostolic of Southern Zanguebar {Zanguebar Meridionale}, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Cassian (Franz Anton) Spiess (Spieß)
Bishop Cassian (Franz Anton) Spiess (Spieß) O.S.B. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Southern Zanguebar {Zanguebar Meridionale}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSankt Jakob am Arlberg, Italy

  • a priest for 15.8 years
  • a bishop for 2.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 430
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1902, Number 65

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast