Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz Leopold von Leonrod

Deceased

Bishop of Eichstätt


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Aug 1827BornAnsbach
31 Dec 185023.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Eichstätt, Germany
14 Jun 185123.8Ordained PriestPriest of Eichstätt, Germany
23 Nov 186639.2SelectedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
22 Feb 186739.5ConfirmedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
19 Mar 186739.6Ordained BishopBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
5 Sep 190578.0DiedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany

MicroData Summary for Franz Leopold von Leonrod:
Bishop Franz Leopold von Leonrod (born , died ) Bishop of Eichstätt

  • a priest for 54.2 years
  • a bishop for 38.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 267

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013