Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adam Senger

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Bamberg

Titular Bishop of Comana Armeniae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jun 1860BornDöringstadt
22 Oct 188222.3Ordained PriestPriest of Bamberg, Germany
2 Dec 191252.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bamberg, Germany
2 Dec 191252.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Comana Armeniae
12 Jan 191352.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Comana Armeniae
1933²72.5ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Bamberg, Germany
21 Mar 193574.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Bamberg, Germany

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Adam Senger:
Bishop Adam Senger (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Bamberg

  • a priest for 52.4 years
  • a bishop for 22.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1913, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015