Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz Anton von Henle

Deceased

Bishop of Regensburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 May 1851BornWeißenhorn
23 Nov 187322.5Ordained PriestPriest of Augsburg, Germany
3 Apr 190149.9SelectedBishop of Passau, Germany
18 Apr 190149.9ConfirmedBishop of Passau, Germany
16 Jun 190150.1Ordained BishopBishop of Passau, Germany
18 Oct 190655.4SelectedBishop of Regensburg, Germany
6 Dec 190655.5ConfirmedBishop of Regensburg, Germany
6 Feb 190755.7InstalledBishop of Regensburg, Germany
11 Oct 192776.4DiedBishop of Regensburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Franz Anton von Henle:
Bishop Franz Anton von Henle (born , died ) Bishop of Regensburg

  • a priest for 53.9 years
  • a bishop for 26.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 442
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1901, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013