Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas (Franz Xaver) Spreiter, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Eshowe

Titular Bishop of Thenae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Dec 1865BornRegensburg, Germany
2 Feb 188822.1ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
25 Jul 189731.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
13 Mar 190640.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Southern Zanguebar {Zanguebar Meridionale}, Tanzania
13 Mar 190640.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Thenae
1 May 190640.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thenae
12 Aug 190640.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Dar-es-Salaam, Tanzania
2 Jun 192155.4ResignedVicar Apostolic of Dar-es-Salaam, Tanzania
29 Aug 192155.7AppointedPrefect of Zululand, South Africa
26 Jan 192458.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Eshowe, South Africa
14 May 194377.4RetiredVicar Apostolic of Eshowe, South Africa
27 Jan 194478.1DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Eshowe, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Thomas (Franz Xaver) Spreiter:
Bishop Thomas (Franz Xaver) Spreiter O.S.B. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Eshowe

  • a priest for 46.5 years
  • a bishop for 37.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1906, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013