Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joachim (Alois) Ammann, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Abbot Emeritus of Ndanda

Titular Bishop of Petnelissus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Feb 1898BornWyl, Switzerland
5 Apr 192022.1ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
9 Mar 192325.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
29 May 193234.3AppointedAbbot of Ndanda, Tanzania
11 Dec 193335.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Petnelissus
11 Mar 193436.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Petnelissus
15 Dec 194850.8ResignedAbbot of Ndanda, Tanzania
19 Aug 198183.5DiedAbbot Emeritus of Ndanda, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Joachim (Alois) Ammann:
Bishop Joachim (Alois) Ammann O.S.B. (born , died ) Abbot Emeritus of Ndanda

  • a priest for 58.4 years
  • a bishop for 47.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1934, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013