Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Theodor (Hermann) Breher, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Yanji [Yenki]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Aug 1889BornOttobeuren, Germany
8 Oct 191122.1ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
16 Jul 191525.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
5 Feb 192939.5AppointedPrefect of Yenki [Yanji], China
13 Apr 193747.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Hieron
13 Apr 193747.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Yenki [Yanji], China
5 Sep 193748.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hieron
11 Apr 194656.6AppointedBishop of Yanji [Yenki], China
2 Nov 195061.2DiedBishop of Yanji [Yenki], China

MicroData Summary for Theodor (Hermann) Breher:
Bishop Theodor (Hermann) Breher O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Yanji [Yenki]

  • a priest for 35.3 years
  • a bishop for 13.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1951
  • ob/c3: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1937, Number 50

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013