Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-François Brizay de Denonville (Brezay)

Deceased

Bishop of (Saint-Bernard de) Comminges


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1641¹BornBlésois
31 May 169352.4SelectedBishop of (Saint-Bernard de) Comminges, France
5 Oct 169352.7ConfirmedBishop of (Saint-Bernard de) Comminges, France
6 Dec 169352.9Ordained BishopBishop of (Saint-Bernard de) Comminges, France
12 Apr 171069.2DiedBishop of (Saint-Bernard de) Comminges, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-François Brizay de Denonville (Brezay):
Bishop Jean-François Brizay de Denonville (Brezay) (born 1641, died ) Bishop of (Saint-Bernard de) Comminges

  • a bishop for 16.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 171
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1693, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 20 Jun 2015