Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Baltazar de Cabanes de Viens

Deceased

Bishop of Vence


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1646¹BornAix en Provence
26 Apr 168640.3SelectedBishop of Vence, France
12 Oct 169347.7ConfirmedBishop of Vence, France
29 Nov 169347.9Ordained BishopBishop of Vence, France
9 May 169751.3DiedBishop of Vence, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baltazar de Cabanes de Viens:
Bishop Jean-Baltazar de Cabanes de Viens (born 1646, died ) Bishop of Vence

  • a bishop for 3.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 407
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1693, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 2 May 2015