Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giacomo Cardinal Lercaro

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Bologna

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Traspontina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Oct 1891BornQuinto al Mare
25 Jul 191422.7Ordained PriestPriest of Genova, Italy
31 Jan 194755.3AppointedArchbishop of Ravenna e Cervia, Italy
19 Mar 194755.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Ravenna e Cervia, Italy
19 Apr 195260.5AppointedArchbishop of Bologna, Italy
12 Jan 195361.2Elevated to Cardinal
12 Jan 195361.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Traspontina
12 Feb 196876.3RetiredArchbishop of Bologna, Italy
18 Oct 197685.0DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Bologna, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Lercaro:
Cardinal Giacomo Lercaro (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Bologna

  • a priest for 62.2 years
  • a bishop for 29.6 years
  • a cardinal for 23.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 115
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1947, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013