Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gilberto Baroni

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Reggio Emilia-Guastalla


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Apr 1913BornGherghenzano
18 Oct 193522.5Ordained PriestPriest of Bologna, Italy
4 Dec 195441.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bologna, Italy
4 Dec 195441.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Thagaste
27 Dec 195441.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thagaste
30 May 196350.1AppointedBishop of Albenga, Italy
1 Sep 196350.3InstalledBishop of Albenga, Italy
27 Mar 196551.9AppointedBishop of Reggio Emilia, Italy
6 Jun 196552.1InstalledBishop of Reggio Emilia, Italy
10 Feb 197359.8AppointedBishop of Guastalla, Italy
30 Sep 198673.4AppointedBishop of Reggio Emilia-Guastalla, Italy
11 Jul 198976.2RetiredBishop of Reggio Emilia-Guastalla, Italy
14 Mar 199985.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Reggio Emilia-Guastalla, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gilberto Baroni: VIAF:88700842
Bishop Gilberto Baroni (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Reggio Emilia-Guastalla

  • a priest for 63.4 years
  • a bishop for 44.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1954
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)
  • c1/i: CB, 31 Dec 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015