Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo Zarri

Bishop Emeritus of Forli-Bertinoro, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Oct 1929 Born
25 Jul 195222.7Ordained PriestPriest of Bologna, Italy
24 May 197646.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bologna, Italy
24 May 197646.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Luni
29 Jun 197646.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Luni
9 Apr 198858.4AppointedBishop of Forli-Bertinoro, Italy
29 May 198858.5InstalledBishop of Forli-Bertinoro, Italy
12 Nov 200576.0RetiredBishop of Forli-Bertinoro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Zarri (VIAF: 88655711)
Bishop Vincenzo Zarri (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Forli-Bertinoro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBologna, Archdiocese of Bologna
Ordained PriestSan Giacomo Maggiore, Basilica, Bologna, Archdiocese of Bologna
Ordained BishopCathedral, Bologna, Archdiocese of Bologna

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Forli-Bertinoro.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 12 Nov 2005
  • c1/i: AM, 6 May 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 6 May 2018

Quantcast