Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Agostino Baroni, M.C.C.I. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Khartoum, Sudan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Oct 1906Born
5 Apr 193023.5Ordained PriestPriest of Sons of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
29 Jun 195346.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Khartoum, Sudan
29 Jun 195346.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Balecium
21 Sep 195346.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Balecium
12 Dec 197468.1AppointedArchbishop of Khartoum, Sudan
10 Oct 198175.0RetiredArchbishop of Khartoum, Sudan
10 Nov 200195.0DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Khartoum, Sudan

MicroData Summary for Agostino Baroni
Archbishop Agostino Baroni M.C.C.I. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Khartoum

EventPlace
Birth PlaceS. Giorgio di Piano

  • a priest for 71.5 years
  • a bishop for 48.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast