Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Claudio Stagni

Bishop Emeritus of Faenza-Modigliana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jun 1939 BornGanzanigo
25 Jul 196324.1Ordained PriestPriest of Bologna, Italy
6 Dec 199051.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bologna, Italy
6 Dec 199051.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Dardanus
13 Jan 199151.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dardanus
26 Apr 200464.8AppointedBishop of Faenza-Modigliana, Italy
30 May 200464.9InstalledBishop of Faenza-Modigliana, Italy
19 Jan 201575.6RetiredBishop of Faenza-Modigliana, Italy

MicroData Summary for Claudio Stagni:
Bishop Claudio Stagni (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Faenza-Modigliana

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Faenza-Modigliana.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127, Number 11,437
  • r: Bollettino, 19 Jan 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 19 Jan 2015