Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ernesto Vecchi

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Bologna, Italy

Titular Bishop of Lemellefa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jan 1936 Born
25 Jul 196327.5Ordained PriestPriest of Bologna, Italy
18 Jul 199862.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bologna, Italy
18 Jul 199862.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Lemellefa
13 Sep 199862.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lemellefa
8 Feb 201175.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Bologna, Italy
2 Feb 201377.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Terni-Narni-Amelia, Italy
21 Jun 201478.4CeasedApostolic Administrator of Terni-Narni-Amelia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ernesto Vecchi
Bishop Ernesto Vecchi (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Bologna

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Matteo della Decima

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Bologna.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 8 Feb 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Number 13,382
  • ab: CB, 2 Feb 2013
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018