Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marcello Morgante

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ascoli Piceno, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Mar 1915Born
26 Feb 193822.9Ordained PriestPriest
16 Feb 195741.8AppointedBishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy
19 Mar 195741.9Ordained BishopBishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy
28 Apr 195742.0InstalledBishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy
13 Apr 199176.0RetiredBishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy
20 May 200792.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Ascoli Piceno, Italy

MicroData Summary for Marcello Morgante
Bishop Marcello Morgante (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ascoli Piceno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCarpineto Sinello

  • a priest for 69.2 years
  • a bishop for 50.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d/c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.1, 12 Sep 2018; Data: 1 Oct 2018

Quantcast