Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Giuseppe Angioni

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Pavia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Oct 1910BornBortigali
13 Aug 193322.8Ordained PriestPriest
28 May 196251.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Pisa, Italy
28 May 196251.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Hippo Diarrhytus
29 Jun 196251.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hippo Diarrhytus
6 Jul 196857.7AppointedBishop of Pavia, Italy
2 Apr 198675.5RetiredBishop of Pavia, Italy
21 Aug 199180.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Pavia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Giuseppe Angioni:
Bishop Antonio Giuseppe Angioni (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Pavia

  • a priest for 58.0 years
  • a bishop for 29.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 92

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 8 Mar 2014