Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph-Marie Le Gouaze

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Port-au-Prince

Titular Archbishop of Anazarbus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Oct 1883BornSaint-Thuriau, France
6 Jul 190723.7Ordained PriestPriest
29 Sep 192743.9AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Port-au-Prince, Haïti
29 Sep 192743.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Dara
18 Dec 192744.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Dara
5 Dec 193047.1SucceededArchbishop of Port-au-Prince, Haïti
24 Jun 195571.7RetiredArchbishop of Port-au-Prince, Haïti
24 Jun 195571.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Anazarbus
31 Jul 196480.8DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Port-au-Prince, Haïti

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Marie Le Gouaze:
Archbishop Joseph-Marie Le Gouaze (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Port-au-Prince

  • a priest for 57.0 years
  • a bishop for 36.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1927, Number 75

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015