Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rémy Augustin, S.M.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Port-de-Paix, Haïti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Sep 1910Born
11 Jun 193322.6Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Company of Mary
8 Apr 195342.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Port-au-Prince, Haïti
8 Apr 195342.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Turuzi
31 May 195342.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Turuzi
20 Aug 196655.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Port-de-Paix, Haïti
18 Sep 197867.9AppointedBishop of Port-de-Paix, Haïti
22 Feb 198271.3ResignedBishop of Port-de-Paix, Haïti
29 Mar 198372.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Port-de-Paix, Haïti

MicroData Summary for Rémy Augustin
Bishop Rémy Augustin S.M.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Port-de-Paix

EventPlace
Birth PlacePétionville

  • a priest for 49.7 years
  • a bishop for 29.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018