Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul-Sanson-Jean-Marie Robert

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Les Gonaïves, Haïti

Titular Bishop of Castra Galbae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 May 1901Born
30 Sep 192322.3Ordained PriestPriest
14 Jan 193634.6AppointedBishop of Les Gonaïves, Haïti
29 Mar 193634.8Ordained BishopBishop of Les Gonaïves, Haïti
18 Aug 196665.2ResignedBishop of Les Gonaïves, Haïti
18 Aug 196665.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Castra Galbae
4 Mar 199492.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Les Gonaïves, Haïti

MicroData Summary for Paul-Sanson-Jean-Marie Robert
Bishop Paul-Sanson-Jean-Marie Robert (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Les Gonaïves

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHelléan, France

  • a priest for 70.4 years
  • a bishop for 57.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1936, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast