Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Julien-Jean-Guillaume Conan

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Port-au-Prince

Titular Archbishop of Seleucia in Isauria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jun 1860BornGuern, France
16 Sep 190343.2SelectedArchbishop of Port-au-Prince, Haïti
22 Oct 190343.3ConfirmedArchbishop of Port-au-Prince, Haïti
13 Dec 190343.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Port-au-Prince, Haïti
5 Dec 193070.5ResignedArchbishop of Port-au-Prince, Haïti
5 Dec 193070.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Seleucia in Isauria
11 Oct 194484.3DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Port-au-Prince, Haïti

MicroData Summary for Julien-Jean-Guillaume Conan:
Archbishop Julien-Jean-Guillaume Conan (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Port-au-Prince

  • a bishop for 40.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1903, Number 57
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 310

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013