Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Carlo Cardinal Bellisomi

Deceased

Bishop of Cesena, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jul 1736Born
29 May 176326.8Ordained PriestPriest
11 Sep 177539.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tyana
24 Sep 177539.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Tyana
25 Sep 177539.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Germany
14 Feb 178548.5Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
7 May 178548.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Portugal
19 Jun 178649.8ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Germany
21 Feb 179457.5Elevated to Cardinal
21 Feb 179457.5ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Portugal
22 Sep 179559.1AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Cesena, Italy
18 Dec 179559.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Pace
18 Sep 180771.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede
9 Aug 180872.0DiedBishop of Cesena, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Bellisomi (VIAF: 59425060)
Carlo Cardinal Bellisomi (born , died ) Bishop of Cesena

EventPlace
Birth PlacePavia, Diocese of Pavia
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 45.1 years
  • a bishop for 32.8 years
  • a cardinal for 23.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 14 Feb 1785
  • c34: CB, 12 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,775, Number 40
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 233
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 5, Number 238
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 578, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast