Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Menicatti, P.I.M.E. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Northern Honan {Ho-Nan Settentrionale}, China

Titular Bishop of Tanis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Sep 1866Born
15 Aug 188518.9ProfessedMember of Pontifical Institute for Foreign Missions
20 Jan 188922.3Ordained PriestPriest of Pontifical Institute for Foreign Missions
12 Sep 190336.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Northern Honan {Ho-Nan Settentrionale}, China
12 Sep 190336.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Tanis
22 Nov 190337.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tanis
Dec 1920³54.2ResignedVicar Apostolic of Northern Honan {Ho-Nan Settentrionale}, China
23 Dec 194377.2DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Northern Honan {Ho-Nan Settentrionale}, China

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Menicatti
Bishop Giovanni Menicatti P.I.M.E. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Northern Honan {Ho-Nan Settentrionale}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy
Ordained BishopPekin, Vicariate Apostolic of Northern Chi-Li {Ce-Li Settentrionale} o Pe-Kin
Death PlaceMonza

  • a priest for 54.9 years
  • a bishop for 40.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,921
  • ob/c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1,932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,903, Number 54
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 4, Number 121
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 10, Number 511, Ascendance
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast