Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernard-Vincent Laribe, C.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Kiam-Si {Kiangsi}

Titular Bishop of Sozopolis in Pisidia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1802BornSousceyrac, France
182320.4ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Mission
2 Mar 184441.5AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Kiam-Si {Kiangsi}, China
2 Mar 184441.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Sozopolis in Pisidia
13 May 184542.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sozopolis in Pisidia
14 Jul 184542.9SucceededVicar Apostolic of Kiam-Si {Kiangsi}, China
20 Jul 185047.9DiedVicar Apostolic of Kiam-Si {Kiangsi}, China

MicroData Summary for Bernard-Vincent Laribe:
Bishop Bernard-Vincent Laribe C.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Kiam-Si {Kiangsi}

  • a bishop for 5.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 350

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013