Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John William Comber, M.M. †

Deceased

Superior General Emeritus of Catholic Foreign Mission Society of America

Titular Bishop of Foratiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Mar 1906Born
1 Feb 193124.8Ordained PriestPriest of Catholic Foreign Mission Society of America
6 Aug 195650.4AppointedSuperior General of Catholic Foreign Mission Society of America
23 Jan 195952.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Foratiana
9 Apr 195953.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Foratiana
7 Aug 196660.4ResignedSuperior General of Catholic Foreign Mission Society of America
27 Mar 199892.0DiedSuperior General Emeritus of Catholic Foreign Mission Society of America

MicroData Summary for John William Comber
Bishop John William Comber M.M. (born , died ) Superior General Emeritus of Catholic Foreign Mission Society of America

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLawrence, MA

  • a priest for 67.1 years
  • a bishop for 38.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1959, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast