Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Fushun [Fushun]

Dioecesis Fuscioenensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 11 April 1946
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Shenyang [Mukden, Fengtien]
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: China
  • Square Kilometers: 75,204 (29,047 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Mission, Bishop's House, Fushun, Liaoning, China

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Fushun
4 February 1932ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Fushun (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Fushun [Fushun]
13 February 1940ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Fushun Vicariate Apostolic of Fushun [Fushun]
Diocese of Fushun [Fushun]
11 April 1946ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Fushun [Fushun] Diocese of Fushun [Fushun]

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Fushun [Fushun]
194910,0006,250,000.2%881,2501617ap2002

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.0, 29 Jul 2012; data: 3 Sep 2012