Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Richard Ham, M.M. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Saint Paul and Minneapolis, Minnesota, USA

Titular Bishop of Putia in Numidia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jul 1921Born
12 Jun 194826.9Ordained PriestPriest of Catholic Foreign Mission Society of America
28 Nov 196746.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Guatemala
28 Nov 196746.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Putia in Numidia
6 Jan 196846.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Putia in Numidia
Feb 197957.5ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Guatemala
7 Oct 198059.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Saint Paul and Minneapolis, Minnesota, USA
30 Oct 199069.3RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Saint Paul and Minneapolis, Minnesota, USA
20 Dec 200281.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Saint Paul and Minneapolis, Minnesota, USA

MicroData Summary for James Richard Ham
Bishop James Richard Ham M.M. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Saint Paul and Minneapolis

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChicago, IL, Archdiocese of Chicago, Illinois
Ordained PriestMaryknoll, NY

  • a priest for 54.5 years
  • a bishop for 34.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)
  • c1: CB, 11 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 20 Feb 2018