Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antoine-Pierre-Jean Fourquet, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Guangzhou [Canton]

Titular Archbishop of Gangra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Mar 1872BornEus, France
29 Feb 189624.0Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
20 Feb 192351.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Canton [Guangzhou], China
20 Feb 192351.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Themisonium
16 Sep 192351.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Themisonium
11 Apr 194674.1AppointedArchbishop of Guangzhou [Canton], China
11 Dec 194775.8RetiredArchbishop of Guangzhou [Canton], China
21 Jun 194876.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Gangra
18 Feb 195279.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Guangzhou [Canton], China

MicroData Summary for Antoine-Pierre-Jean Fourquet:
Archbishop Antoine-Pierre-Jean Fourquet M.E.P. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Guangzhou [Canton]

  • a priest for 56.0 years
  • a bishop for 28.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: JPG
  • c3+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1923, Number 53

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013