Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guido Maria Mazzocco

Deceased

Bishop of Adria, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Feb 1883Born
17 Jun 190522.3Ordained PriestPriest
12 Nov 193653.7AppointedBishop of Adria, Italy
21 Dec 193653.8Ordained BishopBishop of Adria, Italy
8 Nov 196885.6DiedBishop of Adria, Italy

MicroData Summary for Guido Maria Mazzocco
Bishop Guido Maria Mazzocco (born , died ) Bishop of Adria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAgugliaro

  • a priest for 63.3 years
  • a bishop for 31.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1,939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,936, Number 90

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast