Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pietro Tagliapietra

Deceased

Archbishop of Spoleto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Dec 1884BornVenezia
25 Jul 190823.5Ordained PriestPriest
22 Feb 193247.1AppointedBishop of San Severino (-Treia), Italy
1 May 193247.3Ordained BishopBishop of San Severino (-Treia), Italy
12 Sep 193449.6AppointedArchbishop of Spoleto, Italy
11 May 194863.3DiedArchbishop of Spoleto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Tagliapietra:
Archbishop Pietro Tagliapietra (born , died ) Archbishop of Spoleto

  • a priest for 39.7 years
  • a bishop for 16.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1949
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1932, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015