Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul-François-Marie de Forges

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo)

Titular Bishop of Taenarum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Aug 1822BornRedon
20 Dec 184523.3Ordained PriestPriest
21 Sep 187755.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Rennes, France
21 Sep 187755.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Taenarum
21 Nov 187755.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Taenarum
26 Feb 187855.5ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Rennes, France
11 Aug 190078.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo), France

MicroData Summary for Paul-François-Marie de Forges:
Bishop Paul-François-Marie de Forges (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo)

  • a priest for 54.6 years
  • a bishop for 22.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 533

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013