Catholic-Hierarchy DC

George Basil Cardinal Hume, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain

Cardinal-Priest of San Silvestro in Capite


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Mar 1923Born
23 Sep 194219.5ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
23 Sep 194522.5Solemn VowsMember of Order of Saint Benedict
23 Jul 195027.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
9 Feb 197652.9AppointedArchbishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain
25 Mar 197653.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain
24 May 197653.2Elevated to Cardinal
24 May 197653.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Silvestro in Capite
17 Jun 199976.2DiedArchbishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for George Basil Hume (VIAF: 17224203)
George Basil Cardinal Hume O.S.B. (born , died ) Archbishop of Westminster

EventPlace
Birth Place4 Ellison Place, Newcastle-on-Tyne, Diocese of Hexham and Newcastle, England
Ordained PriestSt. Lawrence, Abbey, Ampleforth, York, North Yorkshire, Diocese of Middlesbrough, England
Ordained BishopMost Precious Blood, Cathedral, Westminster, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England
Death PlaceSts. John and Elizabeth, Hospital, St. John's Wood, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England
Buried Place (Original)Sts. Gregory and Augustine Chapel, Most Precious Blood, Cathedral, Westminster, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England

  • a priest for 48.9 years
  • a bishop for 23.2 years
  • a cardinal for 23.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 155, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 128, and Page 129
  • prof: CB, 11 Feb 2016
  • sole: CB, 12 Feb 2016
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 5 Nov 2018

Quantcast