Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Basil Edward Christopher Butler, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Nova Barbara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 May 1902Born
30 Sep 193028.3ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
1 Oct 193230.4Solemn VowsMember of Order of Saint Benedict
10 Jun 193331.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
29 Nov 196664.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain
29 Nov 196664.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Nova Barbara
21 Dec 196664.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nova Barbara
20 Sep 198684.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Basil Edward Christopher Butler (VIAF: 69741691)
Bishop Basil Edward Christopher Butler O.S.B. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Westminster

EventPlace
Birth PlaceReading, Berkshire, Diocese of Portsmouth, England
Ordained PriestSt. Gregory, Abbey, Downside, Radstock, Somerset, Diocese of Clifton, England
Ordained BishopMost Precious Blood, Cathedral, Westminster, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England
Death PlaceSts. John and Elizabeth, Hospital, St. John's Wood, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England
Buried Place (Original)St. Gregory, Abbey, Downside, Radstock, Somerset, Diocese of Clifton, England

  • a priest for 53.2 years
  • a bishop for 19.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • prof: CB, 29 Feb 2012
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 54
  • sole: CB, 12 Feb 2016
  • mn/dp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 7 Jul 2018

Quantcast