Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Joseph O’Brien

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Westminster, England, Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Manaccenser


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Aug 1930Born
12 Jun 195423.8Ordained PriestPriest of Westminster, England, Great Britain
28 Jun 197746.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain
28 Jun 197746.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Manaccenser
21 Sep 197747.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Manaccenser
30 Jun 200574.9RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain
11 Apr 200776.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Westminster, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for James Joseph O’Brien
Bishop James Joseph O’Brien (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Westminster

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWood Green, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England
Ordained PriestMost Precious Blood, Cathedral, Westminster, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England
Ordained BishopMost Precious Blood, Cathedral, Westminster, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England
Death PlaceAll Saints, Pastoral Center, London Colney, St Albans, Hertfordshire, Archdiocese of Westminster, England
Buried Place (Original)Our Lady of Lourdes, Church, New Southgate, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England

  • a priest for 52.8 years
  • a bishop for 29.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 155, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast