Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Hangzhou [Hangchow]

Archidioecesis Hamceuvensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 11 April 1946
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: China
  • Square Kilometers: 34,000 (13,132 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Mission, Archbishop's House, Hangzhou, Zhejiang, China

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Western Chekiang {Ce-Kiam Occidentale}
10 May 1910ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Western Chekiang {Ce-Kiam Occidentale} (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Hangchow [Hangzhou]
3 December 1924ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Western Chekiang {Ce-Kiam Occidentale} Vicariate Apostolic of Hangchow [Hangzhou]
Archdiocese of Hangzhou [Hangchow]
11 April 1946ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Hangchow [Hangzhou] Archdiocese of Hangzhou [Hangchow]

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Hangzhou [Hangchow]
195027,0036,467,246.4%30326243512032ap2002

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 1 Jul 2013